Pinkman et al. v. Ford et al.
Plaintiff: Guy Pinkman, Bret Davis, Dustin Morton, Steven Dolezal and Michael Hohbein
Defendant: Niles R. Ford and City of Lincoln, Nebraska
Case Number: 4:2008cv03147
Filed: July 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: David L. Piester
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JUDGMENT regarding 29 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss (filing 29 ), Plaintiffs' counsel's representation that Defendants do not object to Plaintiffs motion and that the parties have agreed that this action should be dismissed with prejudice, and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own attorneys' fees and costs. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - Plaintiffs' motion (filing 22 ) requesting additional time in which to respond to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (filing 16 ) is granted; Plaintiffs shall file a responsive brief and any evidentiary materials on or before February 26, 2009. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF PROTECTION regarding Motion for Protective Order 19 . The stipulation of protection order is hereby adopted by the terms of that stipulation, and shall be binding on all parties and counsel of record as set forth therein. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinkman et al. v. Ford et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niles R. Ford
Represented By: Connor L. Reuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lincoln, Nebraska
Represented By: Connor L. Reuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Pinkman
Represented By: John E. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret Davis
Represented By: John E. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Morton
Represented By: John E. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Dolezal
Represented By: John E. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hohbein
Represented By: John E. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?