Tumeh v. McDonald's Corporation
Plaintiff: Karen Tumeh
Defendant: McDonald's Corporation
Case Number: 4:2008cv03150
Filed: July 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Civil Rights: Accommodations Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: David L. Piester
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time, filing 20 , is granted and the deadline for filing the Rule 26 Report is postponed until the pending Motion to Dismiss filing 10 has been ruled upon, or October 31, 2008, whichever first occurs. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (GJG, )
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER regarding Rule 26 Meeting Report 9 . No such report has been received. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED, the parties shall report to the court in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) on or before October 7, 2008, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon them in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f) and 37(g). Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (LKL)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Plaintiffs unopposed motion for an enlargement of time (filing 15 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall have until October 20, 2008, to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss (filing 10 ). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG, )
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (GJG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tumeh v. McDonald's Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Tumeh
Represented By: Shirley A. Mora James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?