Henderson v. Houston
Petitioner: Terrell Henderson
Respondent: Robert Houston
Case Number: 4:2008cv03219
Filed: October 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (filing no. 28 ) is granted. Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel (filing no. 32 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion before the Eighth Circuit. Petitioner's Motion for Certificate of Appealability (filing no. 30 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion before the Eighth Circuit. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT regarding Memorandum and Order, 25 . Pursuant to the Memorandum and Order entered this date, the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Terrell Henderson is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-This matter is before the court on Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment (filing no. 12 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Responde nt shall file an answer and separate brief no later than 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. No later than 30 days following the filing of Respondent's brief, Petitioner shall file and serve a brief in response. No later than 30 days after the filing of Petitioner's brief, Respondent shall file and serve a reply brief. Petitioner's Motion for Additional State Court Records (filing no. 14 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion after Respondents submission of state court records as set forth above. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKH)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-Upon initial review of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing 1 ) the court preliminarily determines that the following claims are potentially cognizable in federal court: Claims 1-7. By 12/25/2008 the respondent shall f ile a motion for summary judgement or an answer. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: Deadline for Respondent to file answer or motion for summary judgment set for 12/25/2008. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed and copy to pro se party)(LKL)
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Petitioner will not be required to pay the $5.00 fee at this time. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrell Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?