Loos v. Chertoff
Plaintiff: Michelle Lindner Loos
Defendant: Michael Chertoff
Case Number: 4:2008cv03241
Filed: December 4, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: David L. Piester
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. A separate judgment will be entered dismissing this matter with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAE)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. It is ordered that: (1)The following matter previously scheduled before the undersigned is herewith referred to Judge Zwart, to wit,(A)Nature of hearing:Pretrial conference.(B)Date and time of hearing: Thursday, April 29, 2010, at 10:00 a.m.( C)Place of hearing: Judge Zwart's chambers, Room 566, United States Courthouse and Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall, North, Lincoln, Nebraska.(2)Judge Zwart will issue a report and recommendation or order as is appropriate. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding 16 Partial Motion to Dismiss. 1. Defendant's motion to dismiss (filing 16 ) is granted as to Plaintiff's disability-discrimination claims asserted under Title VII and the Americans with Disabilities Act, a nd such claims are dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b)(6) for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Hence, Plaintiff's first cause of action is one for disability discrimination (failure to provide the reasonable ac commodation of training) under the Rehabilitation Act only. 2. Defendant's motion to dismiss (filing 16 ) Loos's claim that the defendant failed to promote her due to her disability is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust adm inistrative remedies. 3. Defendant's motion to dismiss (filing 16 ) is granted as to Plaintiff's second (breach of contract) and third (promissory estoppel) causes of action, brought pursuant to state law, for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER deposition deadline is December 23, 2009; Pretrial Conference set for 4/29/2010 at 12:00 PM before Judge Richard G. Kopf; Jury Trial set for 5/24/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge Richard G. Kopf. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (CCB)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - With the agreement of Judge Piester, the Chief Judge and the other district judges, Judge Kopf has begun handling all magistrate matters previously handled by Judge Piester. As to those cases listed, unless a party files a moti on to request a telephonic planning conference on or before July 10, 2009, no planning conference will be held to discuss the scheduling of the case to trial, and a final progression order will be entered based on the representations set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LKH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loos v. Chertoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Lindner Loos
Represented By: Denise L. Saathoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Chertoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?