Herrick et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2009cv00405
Filed: November 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Insurance Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the parties' stipulation for dismissal 55 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, the above-captioned case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KBJ)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SETTLEMENT ORDER. The court has been advised that the parties in the above-captioned matter have reached a settlement of their claims. Accordingly,IT IS ORDERED that:(1)Within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall fi le a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court (and provide a copy to the magistrate judge and to United States District Judge Richard G. Kopf, the trial judge to whom this case is assigned), toget her with submitting to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case;(2)Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice;(3)This case is removed from the court's August 29, 2011 trial docket upon representation by the parties that the case has settled.***Set Dismissal Papers Deadline -- due by 9/26/2011. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PRETRIAL ORDER - estimated length of trial is 4 days; Jury Trial set for 8/29/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge Richard G. Kopf.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Continue Jury Trial set for 8/29/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge Richard G. Kopf. Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2011 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying as moot 34 Motion to Continue; granting 35 Motion to Continue.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Continue. Discovery deadline extended to 1/31/2011. Jury Trial set for 6/27/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge Richard G. Kopf. Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2011 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER - The Joint Motion to Amend the Progression Order 26 is granted as set forth in this Order. The pretrial conference and trial remain scheduled for January 4, 2011 and January 17, 2011, respectively. The parties are advised, however, that if an opposed dispositive motion or a Daubert motion is filed after September 30, 2010, the pretrial conference and trial may be continued on the court'sown motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KBJ)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion to withdraw filed by William E. Gast, (filing no. 16 ), is granted upon the filing of an entry of appearance by defendants new counsel. Mr. Gast shall promptly forward a copy of this order to Rex Rezac of the Fraser, Stryker law firm. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting granting 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Don E. Theobald. The plaintiffs are given 20 days from the date of this order in which to either: (1) obtain the services of substitute counsel and have that attorne y file an appearance in their behalf; or (2) file a statement informing the court of their intent to proceed in this case without counsel. If neither of these actions is taken within the next 20 days, this case will be subject to dismissal. The plai ntiffs' unopposed motion to continue, (filing no. 8 ), is granted, and the parties' Rule 26(f) Report of Parties Planning Conference shall be filed on or before March 4, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copies mailed as directed)(JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrick et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?