Lopez v. Houston
Petitioner: Daniel Lopez
Respondent: Robert Houston
Case Number: 4:2009cv03045
Filed: March 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 filed by Daniel Lopez will be dismissed in its entirety.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Upon initial review of petitioner's proposed amendment (Filing No. 14 at CM/ECF p. 1), the Court preliminarily determines that it is potentially cognizable in federal court. Petitioner's motion to amend petition for writ of habeas corpus 14 is granted and the original petition shall be considered amended by the motion. By September 4, 2009, the procedures listed in this order shall be followed by Respondent. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case managemen t deadline in this case using the following text: September 4, 2009: deadline for respondent to file brief and state court records. No later than 30 days after the filing of respondent's brief, petitioner shall file and serve a brief in response. Petitioner shall submit no other documents without leave of the Court. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAE)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 , the Court preliminarily determines that both of petitioner's claims, as set forth in this memorandum and order, are potentially cognizable in federal court . Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel 1 is denied without prejudice to reassertion. The clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 to respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By May 8, 2009, respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/8/2009 - deadline for respondent to file answer or motion for summary judgment. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party. Copies mailed as directed. )(JAE)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER provisionally granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, but petitioner shall pay the $5.00 filing fee by May 9, 2009. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text. May 9, 2009: deadline for payment of the $5.00 filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?