Hruby v. Albertson's, Inc.
Plaintiff: Elaine A. Hruby
Defendant: Albertson's, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv03204
Filed: October 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf (REFERRAL JUDGE)
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER For Dismissal With Prejudice granting Stipulation for Dismissal 57 . ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that (1) the Complaint of the Plaintiff Elaine A. Hruby against Defendant Albertson's Inc. is hereby dismissed with prejudice; (2) the Thi rd 2 Party Complaint of the Defendant Albertson's, Inc. against Third Party Defendants Bradley Operating Limited Partnership and Heritage Property Investment Trust Inc. is hereby dismissed with prejudice; and (3) each party is to pay its own costs associated with the litigation. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (TEL)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 Oral Motion requesting a continuance in the deadline to file dismissal papers for 30 days. Case Management Deadline set for 3/14/2011. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 37 Motion to Continue. A non-jury trial is set to commence on January 24, 2011 before the Honorable Warren K. Urbom. The pretrial conference will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on January 6, 2011 at 1:00 p.m. The discovery and deposition deadline is August 27, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAE)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendant's unopposed motion to file a third party complaint, (filing no. 15 ), is granted. The defendant's third party complaint, a copy of which is attached to the defendant's motion, shall be filed on or before February 15, 2010. Amended Complaint due by 2/15/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. It is ordered that: (1)The following matter previously scheduled before the undersigned is herewith referred to Judge Zwart, to wit,(A)Nature of hearing:Pretrial conference.(B)Date and time of hearing: Thursday, July 29, 2010, at 11:00 a.m.(C) Place of hearing: Judge Zwart's chambers, Room 566, United States Courthouse and Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall, North, Lincoln, Nebraska.(2)Judge Zwart will issue a report and recommendation or order as is appropriate. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hruby v. Albertson's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine A. Hruby
Represented By: Peter C. Wegman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertson's, Inc.
Represented By: William J. Birkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?