Carlson v. Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: Christy L Carlson
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska and Ken Hubbard
Case Number: 4:2009cv03213
Filed: October 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf (REFERRAL JUDGE)
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The parties are directed to show cause, within 10 days, why the court should not enter judgment dismissing with prejudice the plaintiff's Title VII retaliation claim, with each party to pay their own costs and attorney's fees. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or for a New Trial (filing no. 72 ) is granted to the extent that the judgment (filing no. 58 ) on the Title VII retaliation claim is set aside, the judgment (filing no. 76 ) awarding attorney fees and costs regarding the judgment on the Title VII retaliation claim is set aside, and a new trial is ordered on liability and damages regarding the Title VII retaliation claim. The judgment (filing no. 58 ) finding in favor of the defendants on all other claims is not altered and remains in full force. The defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or for a New Trial (filing no. 72 ) is otherwise denied. This matter is referred to Judge Zwart for trial setting. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees (filing 62 ) is granted. Judgment shall be entered by separate document generally providing that the plaintiff is awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $20,037.40. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER directing counsel to withdraw their exhibits submitted in the jury trial within 14 days. If counsel fail to withdraw these exhbiits, counsel will be ordered to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (CCB)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiff shall not be ordered reinstated or awarded front pay. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KBJ)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Continue. Discovery deadline has been continued to July 16, 2010. Jury Trial set for 11/29/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge Richard G. Kopf. Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. It is ordered that:(1)The following matter previously scheduled before the undersigned is herewith referred to Judge Zwart, to wit,(A)Nature of hearing:Pretrial conference.(B)Date and time of hearing: Thursday, August 19, 2010, at 11:00 a.m.(C )Place of hearing: Judge Zwart's chambers, Room 566, United States Courthouse and Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall, North, Lincoln, Nebraska.(2)Judge Zwart will issue a report and recommendation or order as is appropriate. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson v. Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy L Carlson
Represented By: Joy A. Shiffermiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Hubbard
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?