Campbell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2009cv03256
Filed: December 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on Review of the Final Decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. The Commissioner of Social Securitys decision is reversed, and the case is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with the memorandum accompanying this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (MKR)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Defedant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief. the Defendants Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Brief, filing 27, is granted and the defenda nt shall have on or before September 27, 2010, in which to file and serve its response; within one week after the defendant's response brief is filed, the plaintiff may file a reply brief and either party may request oral argument or make any ot her request which may be permitted under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and in the absence of an order setting the case for oral argument or scheduling further proceedings, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 2 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL) Modified on 8/30/2010 to correct paragraph number (EJL, ).
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief. Defendant's Response due 8/26/2010, plaintiff's reply within one week after the defendant's response brief is filed. Deadline set for 9/3/2010. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extensionof Time to File Brief. The plaintiffs brief shall be filed on or before June 21, 2010; the defendant shall have 35 days from the date on which the plaintiff's brief is filed in which to file an answer brie f; within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file a reply brief and either party may request oral argument or make any other request which may be permitted under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and in the absence of an order setting the case for oral argument or scheduling further proceedings, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof.Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief. The plaintiff shall have on or before June 15, 2010, in which to file and serve her brief; and all other deadlines are extended by four days. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Extensiono f Time to File Brief. the plaintiff shall file and serve her brief on or before June 11, 2010; The defendant shall have 35 days from the date on which the plaintiffs brief is filed in which t o file an answer brief; within one week after the defendants answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file a reply brief and either party may request oral argument or make any other request which may be permitted under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and in the absence of an order setting the case for oral argument or scheduling further proceedings, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 4 above. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief. Case Management Deadline set for 7/19/2010. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?