Sires v. Heineman et al
Case Number: 4:2010cv03020
Filed: February 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Filing 55 , Case No. 8:09CV157; Filing 26 , Case No. 4:10CV3020; Filing 25 , Case No.4:10CV3021) is granted; Defendants motion to strike (filing 77 , Case No. 8:09CV157; filing 49 , Case No. 4:10CV3020; filing 48 , Case No. 4:10CV3021) is denied as moot; Judgment in each of these consolidated actions will be entered by separate document. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00157-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03020-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03021-RGK-CRZ. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KBJ)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order 70 in case 8:09cv157, 42 in case 4:10cv3020, and 41 in case 4:10cv3021 is denied. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00157-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03020-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03021-RGK-CRZ. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KBJ)
September 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting (67) Motion to Extend in case 8:09-cv-00157-RGK-CRZ Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00157-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03020-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03021-RGK-CRZ. The Plaintiffs deadline for disclosure of experts is extended to 60 days after this Courts ruling o n the Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of qualified immunity. Within ten days following the courts decision on qualified immunity, the parties shall contact the chambers of the undersigned to schedule a conference call to discuss the progression schedule for this case to trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - Plaintiffs' motions to extend the deadline to respond to Defendants' motions for summary judgment (Case No. 8:09CV157, filing 62 ; Case No. 4:10CV3020, filing 34 ; Case No. 4:10CV3021, filing 33 ) are granted, to the extent set f orth below; Plaintiffs' response deadline for the motions for summary judgment are stayed until a date to be determined after the court has considered and ruled upon Plaintiffs' motions to conduct limited discovery (Case No. 8:09CV157, fili ng 63 ; Case No. 4:10CV3020, filing 35 ; Case No. 4:10CV3021, filing 34 ). The court will advise the parties of the new response deadline at the time that it rules upon Plaintiffs' motions to conduct limited discovery. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 31 Defendant's Motion to Seal. Defendants' brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (filing 28 ) and Defendants' Evidence Index in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and the attached evidence (filing 30 ) are hereby placed under seal and access is restricted to the court and the parties to this action, including counsel of record. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 50 ) Motion to Stay in case 8:09-cv-00157-RGK-CRZ; granting 21 Motion to Stay in case 4:10-cv-03020-RGK-CRZ; granting 20 Motion to Stay in case 4:10-cv-03021-RGK-CRZ without prejudice to the plaintiffs filing a prop erly supported motion to conduct limited discovery to address the issue of qualified immunity. If, after a ruling on the anticipated summary judgment, this case is not dismissed in its entirety, the parties shall contact the undersigned's chamb ers, within 10 days of the summary judgment ruling to discuss necessary amendments, if any, to the Final Progression Order. If the defendants do not file the anticipated motion for summary judgment, discovery will resume pursuant to the Final Progres sion Order. The clerk shall file this memorandum and order in the lead case, 8:09-cv-00157, and spread the text and order to the member cases. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00157-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03020-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03021-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG )
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting (48) Motion to Extend Deadline in case 8:09-cv-00157-RGK-CRZ; granting (19) Motion to Extend in case 4:10-cv-03020-RGK-CRZ; granting (18) Motion to Extend in case 4:10-cv-03021-RGK-CRZ. The defendants' deadline for filing a motion for summary judgment on the basis of qualified immunity is continued to July 1, 2010. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00157-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03020-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03021-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR, )
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - No telephonic planning conference will be held to discuss the progression of this case to trial. On the contrary, a final progression order is now issued as set forth in the following paragraph: The Motion to Amend 45 in case 8:09-cv-00157 is granted. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2011 before Judge Richard G. Kopf. Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2011 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Depositions due 11/1/2010. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00157-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03020-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03021-RGK-CRZ. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - The motion to dismiss (filing 41 in Case No. 8:09CV157, filing 11 in Case No. 8:10CV3020 and filing 11 in Case No. 8:10CV3021) is granted.The claims against Defendant Clare E. Mahon brought by Plaintiffs O'Meara, Gerdes, Thurmond, Hyde, Seiler and Botts are hereby dismissed without prejudice or limitations to these Plaintiffs' claims against the remaining Defendants and are dismissed without prejudice to re-filing against Mahon. Plaintiffs O'Meara, Gerdes, Thurmond, Hyde, Seiler and Botts' claims against the other Defendants remain pending. The Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska shall adjust the court's computerized record-keeping system to reflect the dismissal of Clare E. Mahon. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00157-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03020-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03021-RGK-CRZOrdered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TCL )
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting motions for consolidation of cases. Case number 8:09CV157, filing nos. 36, 37, and 38; case number 4:10CV3020, filing nos. 6 , 7 , and 8 ; and case number 4:10CV3021, filing nos. 6, 7, and 8, are granted. Case number 8:09CV157, OMeara, et. al. v. Heineman, et. al. is hereby designated as the "Lead Case." The remaining cases, (4:10CV3020 and 4:10CV3021) are hereby designated as the "Member Cases." On or before March 10, 2010, the defendants sha ll answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs' complaints. The Rule 26(f) Report of Parties' Planning Conference shall be filed on or before April 2, 2010. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00157-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03020-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03021-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sires v. Heineman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?