Montin v. Gibson
Case Number: 4:2010cv03041
Filed: March 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 filed by John Maxwell Montin. Petitioner John Maxwell Montin's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Motion for Summary Judgment 15 filed by Bill Gibson. The Motion for Summary Judgment (filing no. 15 ) is denied without prejudice to reconsideration of the procedural default issue after full briefing. Respondent sha ll file an answer and separate brief no later than November 19, 2010. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for November 19, 2010: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition 1 the court preliminarily determines that both of Petitioner's claims are potentially cognizable in federal court. The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition to Respondents and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By May 3, 2010, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or, in the alternative, state court records in support of an answer. The C lerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: May 3, 2010: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of the cour t is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: June 2, 2010: check for respondent to file answer and separate brief. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed )(KBJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montin v. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?