Steinberg v. Good Samaritan Hospital

Plaintiff: M.D. David Steinberg
Defendant: Good Samaritan Hospital
Case Number: 4:2010cv03085
Filed: May 10, 2010
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL- Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss with prejudice (Filing No. 62 ) is granted; The above entitled lawsuit is dismissed with prejudice; and Each party will pay its own costs. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
October 22, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Defendant Good Samaritan Hospital's 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
August 19, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 12 Motion to Extend Deadlines. All deadlines and/or hearings set in the case progression order entered on 7/2/2010 (Doc. 11 ) are suspended. Counsel shall meet and confer pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and shall file a planning report with the court no later than 9/15/2010. (Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 9/15/2010.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinberg v. Good Samaritan Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Samaritan Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. David Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?