Harrington et al v. Grand Island Express, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Debra Harrington and Greg Harrington
Defendant: Grand Island Express, Inc., Russell D. Luft and Prime, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv03102
Filed: May 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER - The Court accepts the stipulation (filing 83 ) and will dismiss the case with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (TEL)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER:Jury Trial (5 days) set for 8/13/2012 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf.Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Oral Motion. Telephone Conference set for 12/15/2011 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Continue Progression Order Deadlines. Jury Trial set for 10/17/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge Richard G. Kopf. Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2011 at 01:00 PM by WebEx Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Status Conference set for 9/8/2011 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS, )
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On or before August 2, 2010, Attorney Jeff Seely shall register for admission to practice in this court and shall register for the System or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Counsel for the parties shall confer and, on or before August 6, 2010, they shall jointly file a Rule 26(f) Report, a copy of which is attached. The parties' responses to this Report will provide the basis for issuing a fi nal progression order. No planning conference with the court will be held before the final scheduling order is entered absent a timely request by one or more of the parties. If one or more of the parties believes a planning conference is needed to co mplete the Rule 26(f) Report, or if the parties cannot agree on one or more of the deadlines identified in the attached Rule 26(f) Report, on or before July 30, 2010, a party shall contact my chambers at (402) 437-1670, or by email addressed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, to arrange a conference call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington et al v. Grand Island Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Island Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell D. Luft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Harrington
Represented By: Herbert J. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Harrington
Represented By: Herbert J. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?