Kon v. Newton et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Bior Kon
Defendant: Director of Douglas County Jail, Newton and S. Shurnway
Case Number: 4:2010cv03110
Filed: June 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff failed to respond to the court's September 9, 2010, Memorandum and Order 11 requiring that he provide the court with a current address. This action is therefore dismissed without prejudice; and A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(KBJ)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff shall have until October 11, 2010, to apprise the court of his current address, in the absence of which this case will be dismissed withoutprejudice and without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: 10/11/2010 : deadline for informing court of new address. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Joseph Bior Kon shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $24.28 by 9/24/10, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. T he Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at plaintiff's institution. The Clerk is directed to set a pro se case management deadline for 9/24/2010: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (JSF)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding: Complaint - Pro Se 1 filed by Joseph Bior Kon. Due to certain technical defects, the Complaint cannot be further processed until such defects are corrected. Plaintiff has the choice of either tendering the $350. 00 fee to the Clerk of the court or submitting a request to proceed in forma pauperis and an affidavit of poverty in support thereof. Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint on or before July 30, 2010. Fai lure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines set for 7/30/2010: Check for IFP or payment. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party with AO240 form)(JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kon v. Newton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Douglas County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Shurnway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bior Kon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?