Bredthauer
Plaintiff: Susan E. Bredthauer
Defendant: Samuel P. Baird, Delaware Charter Guarantee & Trust Company, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Gale R. Furnas, Charles W. Hoskins, James A. Laphen, Roger Ludemann, Gilbert G. Lundstrom, Paula Luther, James E. McClurg, Campbell R. McConnell, Larry Pfeil, Joyce Person Pocras, Ann Lindley Spence, James W. Strand, Eugene B. Witkowicz and Patricia Young
Case Number: 4:2010cv03132
Filed: July 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109 Breach of Fiduciary Duties
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER APROVING DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING ESOP FUNDS TO UNITED WAY OF THE MIDLANDS - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the remaining $272.50 of cash in the TierOne Corporation Employee Stock Option Plan shall be distributed to the United Way of the Midlands, a charitable organization. Member Cases: 4:10-cv-03132-JFB-TDT, 4:10-cv-03139-JFB-TDT, 8:10-cv-00326-JFB-TDT Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER - The Trustee and his general counsel, Rembolt Ludtke LLP, are entitled to compensation from the assets of the portion of the Net Settlement Fund paid to the TierOne Corporation Employee Stock Option Plan (the "ESOP") in the amount o f $10,255 for time spent or anticipated to be spent in the future. The Trustees special counsel, Matthew Borror, is entitled to compensation from the assets of the portion of the Net Settlement Fund paid to the ESOP in the amount of $18,9 87.50 for time spent or anticipated to be spent in the future. PenChecks is entitled to compensation in an amount as yet to be determined from the assets of the ESOP for PenChecks for future missing participant/default IRA and related services in accordance with the agreement attached to the stipulation as Exhibit B (Filing No. 225), which the Trustee is authorized to execute and deliver. Member Cases: 4:10-cv-03132-JFB-TDT, 4:10-cv-03139-JFB-TDT, 8:10-cv-00326-JFB-TDTOrdered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (AOA)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 STIPULATION AND ORDER - Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Member Cases: 4:10-cv-03132-JFB-TDT, 4:10-cv-03139-JFB-TDT, 8:10-cv-00326-JFB-TDT(AOA)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER - On or before August 24, 2012, the parties shall electronically file a Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and supporting documents or a joint stipulation for dismissal and shall submit to the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order on such motion. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Member Cases: 4:10-cv-03132-JFB-TDT, 4:10-cv-03139-JFB-TDT, 8:10-cv-00326-JFB-TDT Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TEL)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER - The plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce a Copy of their SEC Testimony (Filing No. 181 ) is denied as moot as to defendants Samuel P. Baird, Charles W. Hoskins, James McClurg, Campbell R. McConnell, Ann Lindley Spence , and James Strand. The plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce a Copy of their SEC Testimony with regard to the Objecting Defendants will be ruled upon following plaintiffs' reply time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER - Lead plaintiffs' motion to dismiss (Filing No. 174 in 4:10-cv-03132; Filing No. 161 in 4:10-cv-03139; and Filing No. 132 in 8:10-cv-00326) is granted. The plaintiffs' claims against defendant Joyce Person Pocras in each of these cases are dismissed, without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Member Cases: 4:10-cv-03132-JFB-TDT, 4:10-cv-03139-JFB-TDT, 8:10-cv-00326-JFB-TDT Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TEL)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying (167) Motion for Leave; sustaining (171) Objection in case 4:10-cv-03132-JFB-TDT; denying (154) Motion for Leave; sustaining (158) Objection in case 4:10-cv-03139-JFB-TDT; denying (125) Motion for Leave; sustaining (129) Objection in case 8:10-cv-00326-JFB-TDT. The parties shall have ten (10) days from the date the court rules on the pending motions to dismiss, in which to schedule a telephone planning conference with the court. Counsel for the plaintiffs shall contact the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge within such time period to schedule the telephone planning conference. Member Cases: 4:10-cv-03132-JFB-TDT, 4:10-cv-03139-JFB-TDT, 8:10-cv-00326-JFB-TDTOrdered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER regarding (172) Suggestion of Death in case 4:10-cv-03132-JFB-TDT; (159) Suggestion of Death in case 4:10-cv-03139-JFB-TDT; (130) Suggestion of Death in case 8:10-cv-00326-JFB-TDT - On or before September 4, 2012, the plaintiffs shall fil e a motion for substitution of parties, if appropriate, in accordance with the provisions of Rule 25, or file a motion to voluntarily dismiss Joyce Person Pocras as a defendant in this action, in accordance with Rule 41(a). If the plaintiffs fail to comply with this order the defendant Joyce Person Pocras may be dismissed as a party, without further notice, pursuant to Rule 41 (b). Member Cases: 4:10-cv-03132-JFB-TDT, 4:10-cv-03139-JFB-TDT, 8:10-cv-00326-JFB-TDT Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TEL)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Member Cases: 4:10cv3132, 4:10cv3139, 8:10cv326. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER - On or before April 14, 2011, the plaintiffs shall file a motion for substitution of parties, if appropriate, in accordance with the provisions of Rule 25, or file a motion to voluntarily dismiss Gale Furnas as a defendant in this action, in a ccordance with Rule 41(a). If the plaintiffs fail to comply with this order the defendant Gale Furnas may be dismissed as a party, without further notice, pursuant to Rule 41(b). Member Cases: 4:10-cv-03132-JFB -TDT, 4:10-cv-03139-JFB -TDT, 8:10-cv-00326-JFB -TDTOrdered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER regarding Order on Notice of Related Case, (55 in 4:10-cv-03132-JFB -TDT, 42 in 4:10-cv-03139-JFB -TDT), Order to Show Cause, (7 in 8:10-cv-00326-JFB -TDT). The provisions of the court's September 2, 2010, order remain in effect and, in a ddition to those provisions, the following shall apply. 1. Susan Barker v. Samuel P. Baird, et al., 8:10CV326, is hereby consolidated for all purposes with Susan E. Bredthauer v. Gilbert G. Lundstrom, et al., 4:10CV3132, and Ronald A. Laird v. Gilber t G. Lundstrom, et al., 4:10CV3139. 2. Counsel shall conduct discovery as if these consolidated cases are part of a single case. All future filings shall contain the consolidated case caption, which appears on this order, and shall be served on coun sel in the three cases as described below. 3. Case No. 4:10CV3132 was previously designated as the "Lead Case." Case No. 8:10CV326 is hereby designated as the "Member Case" with Case No. 4:10CV3139, etc. Member Cases: 4:10-cv-03132-JFB-TDT, 4:10-cv-03139-JFB-TDT, 8:10-cv-00326-JFB-TDT. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JAB)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting (54) Notice of Related Case in case 4:10cv3132 and (41) in case 4:10cv3139. The non-movants shall have until September 27, 2010, to show cause why Susan Barker v. Samuel P. Baird, et al., 8:10CV326 should not be consolidated with these previously consolidated cases. Member Cases: 4:10cv3132, 4:10cv3139. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting (39) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:10-cv-03132-JFB -TDT; granting (37) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:10-cv-03139-JFB -TDT. Susan E. Bredthauer v. Gilbert G. Lundstrom, et al., 4:10CV3132, and Ronald A. Laird v. Gilbert G. Lundstrom, et al., 4:10CV3139 are hereby consolidated for all purposes. Case No. 4:10CV3132 is hereby designated as the "Lead Case." Case No. 4:10CV3139 is hereby designated as the "Member Case." The plaintiffs shall file a C onsolidated Complaint with the Court on or before October 1, 2010. The Consolidated Complaint shall be filed using the spread text featureas described above. The Consolidated Complaint shall be the operative complaint and shall supersede all complai nts filed in any of the actions consolidated herein. Pending filing and service of the Consolidated Complaint, the defendants have no obligation to move, answer, or otherwise respond to any of the complaints in the above-captioned actions herein or a ny actions subsequently consolidated with them. The defendants shall have to on or before November 15, 2010, to file a Consolidated Answer, by using the spread text feature, or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Complaint. The plaintiffs shall hav e to on or before December 15, 2010, to respond to any motion to dismiss the Consolidated Complaint. The defendants reply may be filed on or before January 5, 2011. Member Cases: 4:10-cv-03132-JFB -TDT, 4:10-cv-03139-JFB -TDTOrdered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bredthauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel P. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Charter Guarantee & Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gale R. Furnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Laphen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Ludemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert G. Lundstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Luther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. McClurg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell R. McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Pfeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Person Pocras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Lindley Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene B. Witkowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan E. Bredthauer
Represented By: David W. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?