Andersen v Astrue
Plaintiff: Susan M. Andersen
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 4:2010cv03144
Filed: July 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION affirming the Commissioner's denial of Andersen's disability benefits and supplemental social security income benefits claim. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting the defendant's 18 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief 17 . Defendant shall have until May 9, 2011, to file his brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Extend ; plaintiff shall have until March 9, 2011, to file her brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER The plaintiffs Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Filing No. 2 ) is granted; accordingly, the plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without payment of the filing fee.The U.S. Marshal shall serve the summo ns and Complaint without paymentof costs or fees. Service may be by certified mail pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and Nebraska law in the discretion of the U.S. Marshal. To obtain service of process on the defendant, the plaintiff must complete and re turn three summons forms and three USM-285 forms. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the Clerk of the court will sign the summons forms, to be forwarded with copies of the Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ETC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andersen v Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan M. Andersen
Represented By: Glen A. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?