Young v. Heineman et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Rae Young
Defendant: Jon Bruning, John A. Gale, Dave Heineman and Greg Lemon
Case Number: 4:2010cv03147
Filed: July 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 173 is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, Filing No. 153, is denied, and her motion for hearing, Filing No. 156, is likewise denied; Defendant's motion for summary judgment, Filing No. 151, is granted. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this memorandum and order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER - The trial previously scheduled for December 15, 2014, is cancelled. The parties shall have ten (10) days from the date the court rules on the pending motions for summary judgment (Filing Nos. 151 and 153 ), in which to schedule a teleph one planning conference with the court, if necessary, to further progress the case. Counsel for the plaintiff shall contact the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge within such time period to schedule the telephone planning conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER - The plaintiff's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order (Filing No. 135 ) is granted, in part, and denied, in part. The parties shall have an extension of time until July 31, 2014, to file any motions for summary judgment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (AOA)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 70 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey J. Waller terminated. Timothy Sandefur added. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JAB)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY - Leslie Rae Young substitutes Attorney Perry A. Pirsch as counsel of record in place of Harvey B. Cooper. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (AOA)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiff's motion of a preliminary injunction ( Filing No. 7 ) is denied. The temporary restraining order (Filing No. 37 ) is dissolved. The defendants shall answer or otherwise plead within 14 days of the date of this order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (AOA)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 46 Motion for Leave; the supplemental evidence is deemed submitted instanter. The plaintiffs request in her responsive pleading to submit the additional evidence in her Index of Evidence (Filing No. 48) is granted and the additional evidence is deemed submitted instanter. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB, )
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SECOND AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER the defendants' motion to clarify 35 is granted; the defendants are restrained from taking any further action to enforce Nebraska Revised Statute 81-885.03 against plaintiff or the 7/20/2010 cease and desist order against plaintiff, pending further ruling from the court on the preliminary injunction issue, including the issue of an appropriate bond; the plaintiff is enjoined from adding new Nebraska clients pending resolution of the preliminary injunction issue as ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (SED)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - The defendants shall submit a supplemental brief addressing the bond issue and the courts inquiries with respect to similar enactments and challenges in other states by the close of business on Friday, August 6, 2010. The plaintiff shall fil e a supplemental affidavit regarding the number of Nebraska clients and the value of the contracts with those clients by the close of business on Friday, August 6, 2010. An amended temporary restraining order shall issue this date. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed) (MKR)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 7 Motion for TRO. The defendants are restrained from taking any further action to enforce Nebraska Revised Statute § 81-885.03 or the July 20, 2010, Cease andDesist Order against Plaintiff Leslie Rae Young, pending further ruli ng fromthe court on the merits of the plaintiffs claim for declaratory and injunctiverelief; A hearing on the plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction will be held on August 3, 2010, at 9:00 a.m. Counsel may appear by telephone. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MWK, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Heineman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Bruning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Heineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Lemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Rae Young
Represented By: Harvey B. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?