SAHS v. Astrue
Plaintiff: JAMES L SAHS
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 4:2010cv03161
Filed: August 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Sahs' Motion to Amend or Alter (filing no. 44 ) is granted in part and denied in part in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. The court's July 11, 2012, Memorandum and Order is clarified to provide that: The Co mmissioner shall distribute $14,790.97, the amount withheld to pay Sahs' representative, to Sahs' attorney. Thereafter, Sahs' attorney shall immediately refund to Sahs $8,513.30, which is the full amount previously awarded under the EAJA. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motion for attorney fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) (filing 36 ) is granted as follows: a. Sahs' attorney is entitled to an attorney fee of $14,790.97 from Sahs' past-due benefits. b. The Comm issioner shall distribute $14,790.97, the amount withheld to pay Sahs' representative, to Sahs' attorney. However, Sahs' attorney shall immediately refund to Sahs $8,513.30, which is the full amount previously awarded unde r the EAJA. c. Sahs and Sahs' attorney shall provide the Commissioner with documentation showing that the prior EAJA award has been refunded. d. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: 1. Sahs' motion to amend application for attorneys fees (filing 29 ) is granted. 2. Sahs' original application for attorneys fees (filing 26 ) is denied as moot. 3. Sahs' amended application for attorneys fees ( filing 30 ) is granted. 4. The Commissioner's objection to Sahs' amended application for attorneys fees (filing 31 ) is denied. 5. By separate document, the court shall enter judgment for Sahs and against the Commissioner, providing that Sahs is awarded attorney fees of $8,513.30, subject to offset by any preexisting debt that he owes to the United States. 6. Payment of the attorney fee award, minus any applicable offset, shall be made to Sahs' attorney, Stephen Speicher. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Complaint, 1 filed by James L. Sahs. The Commissioner's decision is reversed and remanded pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). On remand, the ALJ shall properly develop the record pursuant to SSR 00-4p and address whether Sahs' impairments satisfy Listing 1.08. Judgment shall be entered by separate document providing that the decision of the Commissioner is reversed and remanded. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAHS v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES L SAHS
Represented By: Stephen L. Speicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?