Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Brenda L. Glinn and M. Jack Glinn
Case Number: 4:2010cv03164
Filed: August 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 51 Stipulation for Dismissal, each party to bear its own costs and fees. This action is dismissed with prejudice, complete record waived, each party to bear its own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (JSF)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Continue. On or before November 8, 2011, the plaintiff shall file its response to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions, Motion to Compel Discovery, and Motion for Extension of Time 38 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 23 Gary Glinn's Motion to Intervene as a party defendant. Gary Glinn's answer and counterclaim shall be filed by 2/1/2011. The clerk shall modify the docket to add Gary Glinn as a named defendant. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Withdraw filed by Starlet J. Japp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda L. Glinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Jack Glinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?