United States of America v. Nelson
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Stephen Nelson
Case Number: 4:2010cv03172
Filed: August 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - A hearing was convened today on the Petitioner's motion for an order requiring the Respondent to show cause, if any, why he should not be held in contempt for failing to comply with an IRS Summons. IT IS ORDERED: 1) Stephe n D. Nelson has failed to show cause why he should not be held in contempt for failing and refusing to comply with an IRS Summons. 2) Stephen D. Nelson is in contempt of court. 3) Stephen D. Nelson can purge this contempt by producing the records lis ted in the IRS summons, (copies of the summons are attached hereto), by April 4, 2011. The Marshal shall personally serve a certified copy of this order on Stephen D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (2 Certified copies to USM with 285 form)(JAB)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION - granting filing, 6 Motion to Compel. For good cause shown, the allegations in the Petitioner's Petition to Enforce IRS summons filing 1 are deemed admitted. Respondent is hereby ordered to produce the documents listed in the summons within fourteen (14) days of the date of service of this Order on him by mailing or delivering same to the office of the IRS, Attention Kay Ponte, 3307 W. Capital Ave., Grand Island, NE 68802. In the absence of the Respondent h aving filed a written response which denied or controverted allegations of the petition (Filing 1 ), the hearing to show cause scheduled for November 1, 2010, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart need not be held and is hereby canceled. A copy of this Order, together with the Motion to Compel, filing 6 be served on the Respondent and that such service be made pursuant to Rule 4.1 of the Federal rules of Civil Procedure, to include service by an official of the Internal Revenue Service specially appointed herein by the Court for that purpose. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - A copy of this order, together with the petition and attachments thereto, be served on the respondent, and that such service be made pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/1/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Laurie M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?