Bond v. Union Pacific Railroad
Plaintiff: Brett Bond
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad
Case Number: 4:2010cv03173
Filed: August 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal IFP (Filing No. 12 ) is granted. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with the courts orders; and A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until April 9, 2011, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to serve Defendant. If Plaintiff does not respond, or if good cause is not shown, this action will be dismissed witho ut prejudice and without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline with the following text: April 9, 2011: deadline for Plaintiff to show cause why service of process was not completed. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff must submit a signed application to proceed in forma pauperis, or pay the $350.00 filing fee, on or before October 1, 2010. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in the dismissal of this ma tter without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to send Plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 10/1/2010 - Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy and form mailed to pro se party)(JAE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bond v. Union Pacific Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?