Zuck v. Sabatka-Rine et al
Petitioner: William W. Zuck
Respondent: Robert P. Houston and Diane J. Sabatka-Rine
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2010cv03203
Filed: October 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Appeal IFP (Filing No. 32 ) is granted. Petitioner's Motion for Certificate of Appealability (Filing No. 36 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion before the Eighth Circuit. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration (Filing No. 31 ) and Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 30 ) are denied. Petitioner shall have until July 28, 2011, to file a motion for certificate of appealability and brief in support. In the event that Petitioner fails to file a motion and brief as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, the court will deny the issuance of a certificate of appealability without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 28, 2011, check for COA. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration 14 of the Memorandum and Order 12 is denied. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(KBJ)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner will not be required to pay the $5.00 fee at this time. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuck v. Sabatka-Rine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert P. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Diane J. Sabatka-Rine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William W. Zuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?