Gdowski v. Lant, et. al
Plaintiff: Tom Gdowski
Defendant: Dan Lant, Gaylene Lant, Sievers and Robert R. Steinke
Case Number: 4:2010cv03233
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - The plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 23 is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal IFP and motion to appoint counsel (Filing No. 17 ) are denied. Plaintiff is not entitled to proceed IFP on appeal and the appeal is dismissed. The clerk of the court shall not proces s the appeal to the Eighth Circuit. The clerk of the court is directed to forward a copy of this memorandum and order to the parties and to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copies mailed as directed)(GJG)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until April 11, 2011, to submit an affidavit to show excusable neglect or good cause for failing to file a timely notice of appeal. If plaintiff fails to submit such an affidavit by April 11, 2011, plaintif f's appeal will not be processed. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Check for affidavit on April 11, 2011. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 15 , Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 13 is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying 11 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAE)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION - Plaintiff's complaint will be dismissed. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(KBJ)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 2 is granted. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KBJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gdowski v. Lant, et. al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Gdowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Lant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylene Lant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sievers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R. Steinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?