Woolman v. Lancaster County Corrections
Petitioner: Michael B. Woolman
Respondent: Lancaster County Attroneys Office
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2011cv03044
Filed: March 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the clerk's office is directed to file the document entitled "Motion for Appealey" as of August 9, 2011, as a Notice of Filing. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Petitioner shall have until September 29, 2011, to file a motion for Certificate of Appealability and a brief in support. In the event that Petitioner fails to file a motion and brief, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, the court will deny the issuance of a certificate of appealability without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management in this case. Petitioners Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis (filing no. 18 ) is denied as moot. ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 9/29/2011: check for filing of motion for certificate of appealability. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court lacks subject matter jurisdiction to issue a writ of habeas corpus in this matter. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- The court lacks subject matter jurisdiction to issue a writ of habeas corpus in this matter. Petitioner shall have until May 20, 2011, to file an amended Petition and clarify whether he his challenging the validity of his convi ction or collateral consequences attached to his conviction. If Petitioner fails to file an amended petition in accordance with this Memorandum and Order, the court will dismiss the Petition without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Check for amended petition on May 20, 2011, and dismiss if none filed. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/20/2011: Check for amended petition on May 20, 2011, and dismiss if none filed.) Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf.
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 5 the Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Petitioner is directed to correct the technical defect in the Petition on or before April 28, 2011. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Cle rk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: April 28, 2011: deadline to submit IFP application or pay $5.00 filing fee. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party including forms) (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woolman v. Lancaster County Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lancaster County Attroneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael B. Woolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?