Hillard v. Bakewell
Petitioner: Robert S. Hillard
Respondent: Dennis Bakewell
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2011cv03054
Filed: April 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment 13 is granted, and the Petition is dismissed without prejudice; A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order; and All other pending Motions are denied. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(KBJ)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 filed by Robert S. Hillard. Upon initial review of the Petition, the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are pot entially cognizable in federal court. Clerk to mail copies. By August 8, 2011, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. No later than 30 days after the filing of the relevant state court rec ords, Respondent shall file an answer. Petitioner's Motion for Summons (Filing No. 6 ) is denied as moot. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/8/2011 deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set September 8, 2011: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (JAB)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) is provisionally granted and Petitioner will not be required to pay the $5.00 fee at this time. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillard v. Bakewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dennis Bakewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert S. Hillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?