Banks et al v. Citimortgage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dennis A. Banks and Janet M. Banks
Defendant: Citimortgage, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Case Number: 4:2011cv03203
Filed: November 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - CitiMortgage's Motion to Dismiss (filing no. 21 ) is granted. Plaintiffs' Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 4 requires service of the complaint on a defendant within 120 days of filing the complaint. However, on the court's own motion, Plaintiffs shall have until June 18, 2012, to complete service of process . No further extensions of time to serve Defendants will be permitted. In the event that Plaintiffs fail to complete service of process on Defendants by June 18, 2012, this matter will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. Th e Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "June 18, 2012: Check for completion of service of summons and dismiss if not completed". The parties are bound by the Federal Ru les of Civil Procedure and by the Local Rules of this court. Plaintiffs shall keep the court informed of their current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs shall have until June 1, 2012, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed. If Plaintiffs do not respond, or if good cause is not shown, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline with the following text: June 1, 2012: deadline for Plaintiffs to show cause why service of process was not completed. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 2 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO. the court finds that the Dataphase factors do not favor Plaintiffs to a degree sufficient to warrant issuance of preliminary injunctive relief. In balancing all of the factors, it is a pparent that Plaintiffs have not alleged, or submitted any evidence showing, that it is probable they will succeed on the merits of their claims. Although Defendants have not yet been served with summons or filed answers, it is likely that the court will dismiss this matter in accordance with Younger principles. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks et al v. Citimortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citimortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis A. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet M. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?