Mitchell v. Bergevin et al
Plaintiff: Cameron Mitchell
Defendant: Lynn Beideck and Jason Bergevin
Case Number: 4:2012cv03033
Filed: February 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the court's orders. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff shall have until April 2, 2012, to apprise the court of his current address, in the absence of which this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 2, 2012: deadline to inform court of new address. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, 2 and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Bergevin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Beideck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bergevin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?