Del Bosque v. Ledford et al
Plaintiff: |
Adan Del Bosque |
Defendant: |
Tim Dewey Trucking Company, CRST International, Inc. and Andrew T. Ledford |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv03045 |
Filed: |
March 7, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
John M. Gerrard |
Presiding Judge: |
Cheryl R. Zwart |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 17, 2013 |
Filing
63
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL - Plaintiff's claims against the defendants, Andrew T. Ledford, Tim Dewey Trucking Company, and CRST International, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA) Modified on 7/18/2013 to change file date (AOA).
|
May 14, 2013 |
Filing
59
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court has been advised that the parties in the above-captioned matter have settled their claims. Within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or ot her dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court, together with submitting to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The clerk shall terminate the pretrial and trial settings for this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
|
March 28, 2013 |
Filing
58
ORDER granting 57 Oral Motion to set aside the progression order and set status conference. The Telephone Conference is set for 5/14/2013 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Plaintiff's counsel shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
|
October 5, 2012 |
Filing
39
ORDER granting 38 Email Motion to modify progression order. Jury Trial set for 7/15/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
October 4, 2012 |
Filing
37
AMENDED PROGRESSION SCHEDULE ORDER - Parties' motion to continue, (filing no. 33 ), is granted, and the progression schedule for this case is amended as follows: Depositions due May 15, 2013.Jury Trial set for 6/17/2013 at 09 :00 AM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2013 at 11:00 AM in by Webex before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zw art. An email will be sent to counsel of record with instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. Telephone Conference set for 3/26/2013 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?