National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al v. Shelter et al
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Defendant: Richard Lapp, Gerald Shetler and W-L Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv03047
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - According to the Joint Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice, ECF No. 81 , the "matters in controversy have been compromised, settled and full accord and satisfaction made." The parties agree that this action and all cross-claims may be ordered dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (AOA)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Oral Motion to schedule settlement conference. Settlement Conference set for 4/3/2013 09:00 AM CST in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. The parties' representatives and/or counsel shall be prepared to participate and negotiate a settlement of this case during the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motion to withdraw filed by Attorney Travis S. Young as counsel of record on behalf of Defendant Wright-Lorenz Grain Co., Inc., (filing no. 73 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion to Continue Status Conference and Extension of Written Discovery Deadline, (Filing No. 71 ), is granted. The telephonic conference scheduled for January 29, 2013 is cancelled. The deadline for completing writte n discovery under Rules 33 through 36 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is March 4, 2013. Motions to compel Rule 33 through 36 discovery must be filed by February 19, 2013. Since many attorneys and parties are involved in this case, counsel shall promptly confer regarding setting a settlement conference and, if all parties are willing to participate, shall discuss whether any of the following dates can be reserved at this time for scheduling a settlement conference: March 18, 25, 27 or 29; April 1, 3, 5, 8, 15, 17, 18, or 19. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 60 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Wright-Lorenz Grain Co., Inc. Jeanelle R. Lust and Knudsen, Berkheimer, Richardson & Endacott, LLP, remain counsel of record for W-L Enterprises, LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Leave to file an amended complaint. Plaintiffs' amended complaint shall be filed on or before July 3, 2012.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension. The plaintiffs shall have on or before June 25, 2012, in which to file and serve its response to the defendant W-L Enterprises Motion to Dismiss 15 . Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al v. Shelter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Nichole S. Bogen
Represented By: Brian J. Adams
Represented By: Thomas C. Sattler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Brian J. Adams
Represented By: Nichole S. Bogen
Represented By: Thomas C. Sattler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Shetler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W-L Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?