Automated Systems, Inc. et al v. First State Bank Hawarden, Iowa
Plaintiff: Insite Data Systems, Inc. and Automated Systems, Inc.
Defendant: First State Bank Hawarden, Iowa
Counter Defendant: Insite Data Systems, Inc., First State Bank Hawarden, Iowa and Automated Systems, Inc.
Counter Claimant: First State Bank Hawarden, Iowa
Case Number: 4:2012cv03059
Filed: March 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: On or before October 31, 2013, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal, or other dispositive stipulation, together with submitting to the undersigned judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case . Absent compliance with this order, this case (including counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of the Court shall set a dismissal papers deadline of October 31, 2013. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL )
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 40 Motion to Continue and Request for Mediation. Trial of this case is continued and is set for 11/19/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Ju dge John M. Gerrard. A settlement conference will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge with counsel and representatives of the parties on October 1, 2013, beginning at 9:00 a.m. in chambers, 566 Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1) Plaintiffs' objection, (Filing No. 33 ), is denied. 2) On or before April 30, 2013, the plaintiffs shall fully respond to request for production no. 24. However, any specific bank customer names, account numbers, or balances shall be redacted before the documents are produced. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Oral Motion to continue trial. Non-Jury Trial set for 10/1/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge John M. Gerrard. Pretrial Confere nce set for 9/17/2013 at 09:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Automated Systems, Inc. et al v. First State Bank Hawarden, Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Insite Data Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Joel G. Lonowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automated Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Joel G. Lonowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Insite Data Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: First State Bank Hawarden, Iowa
Represented By: Daniel E. DeKoter
Represented By: Scott A. Hindman
Represented By: John D. Mayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Automated Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First State Bank Hawarden, Iowa
Represented By: Daniel E. DeKoter
Represented By: Scott A. Hindman
Represented By: John D. Mayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: First State Bank Hawarden, Iowa
Represented By: John D. Mayne
Represented By: Scott A. Hindman
Represented By: Daniel E. DeKoter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?