Hillard v. Bakewell et al
Petitioner: Robert Stacey Hillard
Respondent: Nels Sorenson and Dennis Bakewell
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2012cv03186
Filed: August 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This action is dismissed without prejudice, and a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order; and All pending motions are denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until June 16, 2013, to apprise the court of his current address, in the absence of which this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 6/17/2013. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Respondents shall have 30 days to provide additional briefing and state-court records on the issue of whether Hillard has completed the necessary exhaustion of state court remedies. No later than 30 days after the filing of R espondents brief, Hillard shall file and serve a reply brief. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/16/2013: Deadline for the parties to submit additional briefing) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR, )
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting the 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Petitioner will not be required to pay the $5.00 fee at this time. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STRICKEN-MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs are directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint on or before September 28, 2012. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to each Plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 9/28/2 012: deadline forpayment or filing of IFP application.) In the event Plaintiffs or their representatives seek to file any additional case in this court, the proposed complaint must be accompanied by the full filing fee or motions to proceed in for ma pauperis by each Plaintiff. If Plaintiffs do not comply with this Memorandum and Order, the court will return the proposed complaint to Plaintiffs without filing. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copies mailed as directed)(MKR) Modified on 8/31/2012 to strike per Order 7 (MKR).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillard v. Bakewell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nels Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dennis Bakewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Stacey Hillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?