Tyler v. EPA
Plaintiff: Billy Tyler
Defendant: EPA
Case Number: 4:2012cv03191
Filed: September 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - For the reasons set forth in the court's November 9, 2012, Memorandum and Order (Filing No. 10 ), Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 11 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 8 ) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion in Arrest of Judgment (Filing No. 9 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the court's filing fee and for failure to comply with a court order. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint on or before October 18, 2012. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further not ice. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: October 18, 2012: deadline for payment or filing of IFP application. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyler v. EPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?