Williams v. DeVetter et al
Plaintiff: |
Shannon Williams |
Defendant: |
Susan DeVetter, Denise Lucks, Nebraska US Marshall Service, Ed Creighton, Unknown A and Steven Walters |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv03217 |
Filed: |
October 18, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 6, 2013 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Status and Copies(filing no. 30 ) is granted in part and denied in part in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
May 16, 2013 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is permitted leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $31.00 by June 14, 2013, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. After pa yment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court. The Clerk o f the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution and to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed and to pro se party)(AOA)
|
May 7, 2013 |
Filing
18
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Rectify and Amend Judgment (filing no. 17 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
|
April 8, 2013 |
Filing
14
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee (filing no. 13 ) is granted. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's in stitution. Plaintiff's Complaint (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice to reassertion in his criminal appeal or in a habeas corpus or similar proceeding. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed and to Pro se party)(AOA)
|
February 19, 2013 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (filing no. 11 ) is denied as duplicative and moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
January 9, 2013 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (filing no. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $31.00 by February 8, 2013, unless an enlargement of time is granted in re sponse to a written motion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff' s institution. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 8, 2013: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed as directed and to pro se party) (AOA)
|
December 5, 2012 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until January 4, 2013, to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee or submit a certified trust account statement in support of his Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. In the event that Plaintiff fails to c omply with this Memorandum and Order, this matter will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: January 4, 2013: Check for institutional trust account statement. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?