Beall v. Korn and More Inc
Plaintiff: Justin D. Beall
Defendant: Korn and More Inc
Case Number: 4:2013cv03002
Filed: January 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION - Plaintiff has failed to prosecute this matter diligently and failed to comply with this Court's orders. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff shall have until May 31, 2013, to (1) amend his complaint to sufficiently allege a prima facie case of discrimination under the ADA, and (2) file a copy of his EEOC charge and right-to-sue notice with the Court. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or copies of his EEOC charge and right-to-sue notice, plaintiff's claims against defendant will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Check for amended complaint on June 3, 2013. Plaintiff shall keep the Court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beall v. Korn and More Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin D. Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korn and More Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?