United States of America v. Nelson et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Two Rivers State Bank, Randall C. Nelson, Deborah H. Nelson and Washington County Treasurer
Case Number: 4:2013cv03095
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER approving and adopting the 62 Stipulation of the United States and Two Rivers Bank. All terms of the stipulation are in formce and effect as if fully set forth herein. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -The Nelsons' objections to the magistrate judge's Findings and Recommendation, ECF No. 34 , are sustained; the magistrate judge's recommendation that a default or a default judgment be entered against the Nels ons, ECF No. 33 , is rejected at this time; the parties are directed to confer with one another and schedule a telephonic conference with the magistrate judge within seven days of the date of this order, or as soon as reasonably practicable. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-Randall C. Nelson and Deborah H. Nelson are given until October 24, 2013 to show cause why the court should not enter a default and/or default judgment against them without further notice. This case is stayed pending further order of the court. Therefore, the governments motion to stay, (Filing No. 30 ), is denied as moot. ( Status Report due by 10/24/2013.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed as directed) (MKR)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by the law firm of Abrahams Kaslow & Cassman for defendants, Randall C. Nelson and Deborah H. Nelson. On or before September 30, 2013, defendants Randall C. Nelson and D eborah H. Nelson shall either: (a) obtain the services of counsel and have that attorney file an appearance in this case; or (b) file a statement notifying the court of their intent to litigate this case without the assistance of counsel. The fail ure to do so may result in an entry of default and/or default judgment against them. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order to the defendants, Randall C. Nelson and Deborah H. Nelson, 4383 County Road 21, Kennard, NE 68034. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copies mailed as directed)(MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Nelson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Harris J. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Rivers State Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall C. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah H. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?