Heiden v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Mary I Heiden
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2013cv03118
Filed: June 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Commissioner's decision is affirmed; The appeal is denied; and Judgment in favor of the defendant will be entered in a separate document. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Extend. The defendant shall have on or before March 17, 2014, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff's brief. Within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief. The case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (JSF)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Extend. The defendant shall have on or before January 30, 2014, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff's brief. Within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief. The case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (JSF)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and, accordingly, that Plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without payment of the filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heiden v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary I Heiden
Represented By: Glen A. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?