Smith v. Peart
Petitioner: Ronald G. Smith
Respondent: Mario Peart
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2013cv03173
Filed: October 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed with prejudice, and a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. The court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Filing No. 12 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Filing No. 5 ) is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily decides that Petitioner's Claim is potentially cognizable in federal court. The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorand um and Order and the Petition (Filing No. 1 ) to Respondents and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By January 17, 2014, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. T he Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 17, 2014: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. If Responden t elects to file an answer, the following procedures shall be followed by Respondent and Petitioner, by January 17, 2014, Respondent shall file all state court records which are relevant to the cognizable claims. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 17, 2014: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Peart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mario Peart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?