Cook v. Kenney et al
Petitioner: Todd L. Cook
Respondent: Michael Kenney and Diane Sabatka-Rine
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2013cv03215
Filed: December 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Petitioner's 25 Motion for Leave to Amend Petition; The Petitioner's 27 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Cook's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing No. 1 ) is denied in all respects and this action is dismissed with prejudice. Cook's Motion to Stay Proceedings (Filing No. 7 ) is denied. In light of the foregoing, Cook's Motion for Status (Filing No. 21 ) is denied as moot. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Objection (Filing No. 16 ) is overruled. Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Brief Date (Filing No. 15 ) is granted. Petitioner has until August 11, 2014, to file and serve a brief in response to Respondents Answer and Brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Petitioner's 11 Motion for Appointment of Counsel without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claim, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, is potentially cognizable in federal court. The Cl erk of the court is directed to mail copies of this memorandum and order and the petition to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By June 2, 2014, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state co urt records in support of an answer, the procedure shall be followed by Respondent and Petitioner as set forth within the order. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner's Motion for Stay (Filing No. 5) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 6/2/2014: Deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment.) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Kenney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Diane Sabatka-Rine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Todd L. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?