Gage v. Crete Carrier
Plaintiff: Donald Edward Gage
Defendant: Crete Carrier
Case Number: 4:2013cv03220
Filed: December 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER AND JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the memorandum opinion entered herein this date, filing 18 , IT IS ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss (Filing No. 15 ) is granted. Plaintiff's amended complaint is dismissed. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Clerk shall send one summons and one USM-285 form to plaintiff, together with a copy of this memorandum and order. Plaintiff shall complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk. The USM shall serve the summons and the complaint and amended complaint without payment of costs or fees. The Clerk is directed to set a pro se case management deadline for November 25, 2014: Check for completion of service of summons. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms) (JSF)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff will have 30 days from the date of this memorandum and order to amend his complaint to set forth a short and plain statement of the grounds for the Court's jurisdiction. Plaintiff will have 30 days from the date of this memorandum and order to file sufficient evidence showing that the amount in controversy is greater than $75,000.00, the jurisdictional limit. The Court reserves the right to conduct further review of plaintiff's claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) after plaintiff addresses the matters set forth in thismemorandum and order. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: July 7, 2014: deadline for plaintiff to amend. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 6 ) is provisionally granted, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy emailed to pro se party) (AOA)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: February 3, 2014: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party with AO240 Form)(TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gage v. Crete Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Edward Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crete Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?