Sherrod v. Lacey et al
Plaintiff: James Edward Sherrod
Defendant: Gary E. Lacey, Lincoln Police Department, Nebraska Department of Correctional Services and Nebraska State Patrol
Case Number: 4:2014cv03003
Filed: January 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is not entitled to proceed IFP on appeal. His Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ("IFP") on Appeal (Filing No. 33 ) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 33 ) i s denied without prejudice to reassertion before the Eighth Circuit. The clerk's office is directed to forward a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed )(GJG)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Plaintiff's Motion for a Rehearing (Filing No. 31 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for a Hearing (Filing No. 29 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case (Filing No. 27 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case (Filing No. 23 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 19 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice. All pending Motions are denied. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court's previous Memorandum and Order, granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 6 , is stricken. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 2 remains pending. Pl aintiff has until March 3, 2014, to either show cause why he is entitled to proceed IFP pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(g) or pay the full $400.00 filing and administrative fees. In the absence of either action by Plaintiff, this matter will be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: March 3, 2014: Deadline for Plaintiff to show cause or pay full filing fee. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff James Edward Sherrod shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $15.57 by 2/24/2014, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 2/24/2014: initial partial filing fee payment due. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherrod v. Lacey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary E. Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Correctional Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska State Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Sherrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?