Aurora Cooperative Elevator Company v. Aventine Renewable Energy Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aurora Cooperative Elevator Company
Defendant: Aventine Renewable Energy - Aurora West, LLC and Aventine Renewable Energy Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2014cv03032
Filed: February 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 60 Motion for Leave. 1) The Co-op's motion to amend, (Filing No. 60 ), is granted. The Co-op's amended complaint, a copy of which is attached to its motion, shall be filed on or before June 22, 2015< /b>.2) The Co-op shall promptly serve NELLC.3) Counsel for the parties shall confer and, on or before July 29, 2015, they shall jointly file a Form 35 (Rule 26 (f)) Report. 4) If one or more of the parties believes a planning confe rence is needed to complete the Rule 26(f) Report, or if the parties cannot agree on one or more of the deadlines identified or case progression issues raised in the Rule 26(f) Report, on or before July 22, 2015, a party shall contact my chambers at (402) 437-1670, or by email addressed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, to arrange a conference call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding 51 Motion for Partial Reconsideration filed by plaintiff Aurora Cooperative Elevator Company (Aurora). Aurora's Motion for Partial Reconsideration (filing 51) is granted in part and denied in part, as set forth in the order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (SLP)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Aurora's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 34 is denied. Aventine's Motion to Strike 39 is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (SLP)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave. The plaintiff is granted leave to serve new or substitute summons on defendants Aventine Renewable Holdings, Inc. and Aventine Renewable EnergyAventine Aurora West, LLC. The deadline for serving these defendants is extended to July 1, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aurora Cooperative Elevator Company v. Aventine Renewable Energy Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurora Cooperative Elevator Company
Represented By: Andre R. Barry
Represented By: Richard P. Garden, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin J. Schneider
Represented By: Terry R. Wittler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventine Renewable Energy - Aurora West, LLC
Represented By: Jacob D. Bylund
Represented By: Lance W. Lange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventine Renewable Energy Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob D. Bylund
Represented By: Lance W. Lange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?