DaMoude v. Wells Fargo Mortgage, Bank
Plaintiff: Douglas Duane DaMoude
Defendant: Wells Fargo Mortgage, Bank
Case Number: 4:2014cv03080
Filed: April 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation 10 are adopted in their entirety. This action is dismissed without prejudice. A separate Judgment will be filed. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF) Modified on 9/16/2014 to indicate copy mailed to pro se party (JSF).
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - On or before August 6, 2014, the plaintiff shall file a notice of his intent to proceed with this lawsuit, a motion for substitution of parties, if appropriate, or a motion to voluntarily dismiss this action, in accordance with Rule 41(a). If the plaintiff fails to comply with this order the plaintiff and this action may be dismissed, without further notice, pursuant to Rule 41(b). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 isprovisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DaMoude v. Wells Fargo Mortgage, Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Mortgage, Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Duane DaMoude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?