Clausen et al v. Reserve National Insurance Company
Plaintiff: |
Peggy Clausen and Randall Clausen |
Defendant: |
Reserve National Insurance Company |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv03134 |
Filed: |
June 18, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Cheryl R. Zwart |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 15, 2015 |
Filing
34
JUDGMENT that this action is dismissed, with each party to pay their own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LAC)
|
September 17, 2015 |
Filing
32
ORDER that within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court (and provide a copy to the magistrate judge and to Senior U nited States District Judge Richard G. Kopf, the trial judge to whom this case is assigned), together with submitting to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. This case is removed from the court's trial docket upon representation by the parties that the case has settled. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed)(LAC)
|
August 24, 2015 |
Filing
28
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - A Settlement Conference will be held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart on 9/18/2015 at 9:00 AM in Chambers. Counsel shall submit a confidential settlement statement to the undersigned by email to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov no later than September 11, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
|
April 21, 2015 |
Filing
24
ORDER - 1) The plaintiffs' motion, (Filing No. 22 ), is granted as follows.- a. The named plaintiff, Randall Clausen, is now the Estate of Randall Clausen, by and through Peggy J. Clausen, personal representative;- b. The caption on all docket filings hereafter shall reflect this substitution of parties; and- c. The clerk shall correct the court's docket accordingly.2) The plaintiff's motion to continue, (Filing No. 23 ), is granted. The deposition, written d iscovery, and summary judgment deadlines are extended to July 1, 2015. The trial and pretrial conference scheduling will be discussed during the conference call scheduled to be held on May 12, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?