April 4, 2016 |
Filing
134
ORDER AND JUDGMENT - The joint stipulation 133 is approved and adopted; this action is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
March 4, 2016 |
Filing
121
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to strike 91 is denied. Construed as a motion for a protective order, plaintiff's motion is denied. Construed as a motion to amend, plaintiff's motion is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
January 13, 2016 |
Filing
88
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting Joint Stipulation filing 87 . Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
December 8, 2015 |
Filing
86
ORDER GOVERNING DISCLOSURE OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(d). This matter is before the Court upon the agreement of the parties for an order pursuant to Rule 502(d) of the Federal Rules of Evidence (Filing No. 84 ). It appe ars to the Court that entry of this Rule 502(d) Order will limit further expenditure of time and resources by the Court and the parties, IT IS ORDERED: The production of privileged or work-product protected documents, electronically stored informat ion ("ESI") or information, whether inadvertent or otherwise, is not a waiver of the privilege or protection from discovery in this case or in any other federal or state proceeding. This Order shall be interpreted to provide the maximum protection allowed by Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Nothing contained herein is intended to or shall serve to limit a party's right to conduct a review of documents, ESI or information (including metadata) for relevance, responsiveness and/or segregation of privileged and/or protected information before production. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
October 29, 2015 |
Filing
82
ORDER granting 72 Motion to withdraw and granting 78 Motion to vacate stay. Plaintiffs' motion to schedule discovery conference is granted. The conference is scheduled for: Friday, November 13, 2015, at 8:30 a.m. in Chambers, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 3190, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
|
September 23, 2015 |
Filing
77
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - 1) Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's first cause of action is denied as to all defendants. 2) Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's second cause of action is granted. Plaintiff's Fourteent h Amendment Due Process Violations are dismissed as to all defendants. 3) Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's third cause of action is denied as to all defendants. 4) Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's fourth cause of action is denied as to all defendants. 5) Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's fifth cause of action is granted. Plaintiffs allegations of tortious interference with business relationships are dismissed as to all defendants. 6) De fendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's sixth cause of action is denied as to the City of Lincoln, Nebraska, Chief Tom Casaday, and Chief Jim Peschong and granted as to Officer Russell Fosler. Plaintiffs allegations of negligent hiring, training and supervision, are dismissed as to Officer Fosler. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
June 30, 2015 |
Filing
54
ORDER - On or before July 17, 2015, plaintiff has leave to file his Third Amended Complaint. The defendants' motion (Filing No. 39 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
June 17, 2015 |
Filing
43
ORDER - The stipulation of the parties 42 is approved and adopted. Discovery is stayed pending outcome of defendants' motion to dismiss and plaintiff's cross motion to be submitted in response. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
May 13, 2015 |
Filing
36
ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to file second amended complaint 34 is granted. Plaintiff shall have until May 29, 2015, to file his second amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
March 31, 2015 |
Filing
32
ORDER that a scheduling conference with the undersigned will be held on Tuesday, April 21, 2015, at 8:15 a.m. in Suite 3190, Roman L. Hruska U.S. Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, OMAHA, Nebraska, to establish a final progression order for this case. The parties may participate by telephone by notifying Judge Strom's office prior to said date. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
March 13, 2015 |
Filing
28
ORDER - The motion 27 is granted. Hugh I. Abrahamson and Jill M. Abrahamson are deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for plaintiff. The clerks office shall remove their names from receiving any further notice on CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
February 6, 2015 |
Filing
24
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motion of the Nebraska Liquor Control Commission and Hobert Rupe (Filing No. 13 ) is denied as moot pursuant to the Court's order, Filing No. 21 . The plaintiff's motion to amend his complaint (Filing No. [1 7]) is denied. The motion (Filing No. 15 ) of Tom Casady, Jim Peschong, John Spatz, Russell Fosler, and the City of Lincoln is denied in part and granted in part. All claims against the City of Lincoln and Councilman Spatz are dismissed. The motion to dismiss Tom Casady, Jim Peschong, and Russell Fosler is denied at this time. The following Causes of Action are dismissed as to all defendants: Fifth, Sixth, Eighth, Ninth. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
December 23, 2014 |
Filing
21
ORDER - Plaintiff's motion 19 is granted. Nebraska Liquor Control Commission and Hobert Rupe are dismissed as defendants in this action, noting that plaintiff reserves his right to file an action in a State Court of Nebraska in accordance with the laws of the State of Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|