Valasek v. Washington Mutual Bank et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael L. Valasek |
Defendant: |
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Washington Mutual Bank |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv03180 |
Filed: |
September 3, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
John M. Gerrard |
Presiding Judge: |
Cheryl R. Zwart |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 20, 2016 |
Filing
63
JUDGMENT regarding Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 62 . Pursuant to the court's memorandum and order granting the defendant's motion for summary judgment, final judgment is entered in favor of the defendant and against the plaintiff, providing that the plaintiff shall take nothing and the plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
August 31, 2015 |
Filing
39
ORDER granting 37 Parties' Stipulation for dismissal. Washington Mutual Bank is dismissed as a party, with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
August 24, 2015 |
Filing
35
AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER granting 34 Motion to amend the Final Progression Order. A Telephone Conference is set for 2/16/2016 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Plaintiff's counsel shall place the call. The Pre trial Conference is set for 6/7/2016 at 11:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. The Non-Jury Trial is set for 6/20/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
|
August 17, 2015 |
Filing
33
ORDER granting 32 Motion to Withdraw Joshua C. Dickson and Shilee T. Mullin as Attorneys for defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KMG)
|
June 26, 2015 |
Filing
29
ORDER granting 28 Email Motion Telephone Conference set for 11/17/2015 at 03:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Plaintiff's counsel will initiate the call. Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2016 at 11:00 A M by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Conferencing instructions will be filed separately. Non-Jury Trial set for 3/21/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
|
April 8, 2015 |
Filing
21
ORDER granting 20 Motion to Strike.1. The answer filed by Spencer Fane on behalf of Defendant Washington Mutual Bank ("Washington Mutual") (Filing No. 9 ) is hereby stricken;2. Spencer Fane is allowed to withdraw as counsel for Washington Mutual; and3. Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, solely in its capacity as Trustee for the Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-11, shall be allowed to re-file its answer to the Complaint within five days of the date of this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?