Parker v. Crete Carrier Corporation
Plaintiff: Robert J. Parker
Defendant: Crete Carrier Corporation
Case Number: 4:2014cv03195
Filed: September 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment on liability only (Filing 42 ) is denied; Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Filing 52 ) is granted; To the extent the court has cited and relied on the e xpert report of Richard J. Schwab, Plaintiffs motion in limine (Filing 49 ) to exclude such testimonyis denied; To the extent the court has cited and relied on the testimony of Jill McAdams PA-C, Defendants motion in limine (Filing 57 ) is denied; Judgment in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER - Trial of this matter, set to begin on Monday, January 25, 2016, is continued until further order of the court; and The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to the assigned Magistrate Judge. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies e-mailed as directed to magistrate judge)(MKR)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The parties' discovery arguments and objections, (Filing No. 39 ), are sustained in part and overruled in part as set forth in this order. On or before September 10, 2015, Plaintiff shall further answer Request for Admission No. 6. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER - After conferring with the parties,1) The parties shall further discuss their discovery disputes in good faith, and attempt to resolve them without further court intervention.2) If any discovery issues remain unresolved as of August 21 , 2015, on or before August 24, 2015, the parties shall jointly file a summary, not to exceed ten double-spaced pages in length, which outlines the disputed issues, the objections asserted, and the legal argument as to those issues and objections.3) Any outstanding discovery disputes that are not timely identified as required in the summary report will be deemed waived. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER- Pursuant to the Report and Recommendation of the United States Bankruptcy Judge (Filing 25 ), the referral of this matter to the bankruptcy court is withdrawn; All proceedings in this court with regard to this case shall be stayed until su ch time as Plaintiff or other appropriate party in interest obtains an order of the United States Bankruptcy Court authorizing the employment of Plaintiff's attorney to proceed with the litigation in this court; and The Clerk of Court shall provide Magistrate Judge Zwart with a copy of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (copies provided as directed) (MKR )
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on the 23 Suggestion of Bankruptcy. This case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska pursuant to NEGenR 1.5(a)(1); The Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of N ebraska shall close this case for statistical purposes; and The Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska shall deliver, or send electronically, the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Crete Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crete Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Nichole S. Bogen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Parker
Represented By: Joy A. Shiffermiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?