Mansfield et al v. Federal Land Bank of Omaha et al
Plaintiff: Calvin M. Mansfield and Sandra K. Mansfield
Defendant: AgriBank, FCB, Farm Credit Bank of Omaha and Federal Land Bank of Omaha
Case Number: 4:2014cv03232
Filed: November 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - In Case No. 4:14CV3232, Defendants' first motion for judgment on the pleadings 11 is granted, and Plaintiffs' action is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs' motion for judgment on the pleadings 36 is den ied. Defendants' counterclaim is dismissed without prejudice, as moot. Defendants' second motion for judgment on the pleadings 45 is denied without prejudice, as moot. Final judgment shall be entered by separate document. In Case No. 4:14CV3233, Defendants' first motion for judgment on the pleadings 8 is granted, and all claims alleged by Plaintiffs against Defendants Federal Land Bank of Omaha, Farm Credit Bank of Omaha, and AgriBank, FCB, are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs' motion for judgment on the pleadings 40 is denied. Defendants' counterclaim is dismissed without prejudice, as moot. Defendants' second motion for judgment on the pleadings 49 is denied without prejudice, as moot. Pu rsuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b), with the court finding no just reason for delay, final judgment shall be entered by separate document regarding all claims alleged against the banks. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3), this ca se is remanded to the District Court of Dawes County, Nebraska (Case No. CI 14-103). In Case No. 8:15CV26, Plaintiff's motion for judgment on the pleadings 26 is denied. Defendants' first motion for judgment on the pleadings 29 is gran ted, and Plaintiff's action is dismissed with prejudice. Defendants' counterclaim is dismissed without prejudice, as moot. Defendants' second motion for judgment on the pleadings 38 is denied without prejudice, as moot. Final judgment shall be entered by separate document. Member Cases: 4:14-cv-03232-RGK-CRZ, 4:14-cv-03233-RGK-CRZ, 8:15-cv-00026-RGK-CRZ. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (SLP)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - 1) Defendants' motion for leave to file a counterclaim, (4:14CV3232, Filing No. 33; 4:14CV3232, Filing No. 37; 8:15CV26, Filing No. 23), is granted.2) Defendants' counterclaim, a copy of which is attached to their motion, shall be filed on or before September 2, 2015. Member Cases: 4:14-cv-03232-RGK-CRZ, 4:14-cv-03233-RGK-CRZ, 8:15-cv-00026-RGK-CRZ. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The magistrate judge's findings and recommendation (filing no. 25 in case no. 4:14CV3232; filing no. 29 in case no. 4:14CV3233; filing no. 15 in case no. 8:15CV26) are adopted. The plaintiffs' objections (filin g no. 26 in case no. 4:14CV3232; filing no. 30 in case no. 4:14CV3233; filing no. 16 in case no. 8:15CV26) are denied. The plaintiffs' motions to remand (filing no. 16 in case no. 4:14CV3232; filing nos. 18 and 19 in case no. 4:14 CV3233; filing no. 8 in case no. 8:15CV26) are denied. The plaintiffs in case nos. 4:14CV3232 and 4:14CV3233 shall respond to the defendants' motions for judgment on the pleadings (filing no. 11 in case no. 4:14CV3232; filing no. 8 in ca se no. 4:14CV3233) on or before August 21, 2015. The defendants may reply within 7 days after filing and service of the plaintiffs'responses. Member Cases: 4:14-cv-03232-RGK-CRZ, 4:14-cv-03233-RGK-CRZ, 8:15-cv-00026-RGK-CRZ. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (SLP)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting (6) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 8:15-cv-00026-RGK-CRZ. The following cases are consolidated for all stages of the case prior to appeal, including trial: 8:15cv26, Rice v. Federal Land Bank of Omaha, et al., 4: 14cv03232, Mansfield v. Federal Land Bank of Omaha, et al., 4:14cv03233, Mansfield v. Federal Land Bank of Omaha, et al. 4:14cv03232, Mansfield v. Federal Land Bank of Omaha, et al. is hereby designated as the "Lead Case," and 4:14cv03233 , Mansfield v. Federal Land Bank of Omaha, et al. and 8:15cv26, Rice v. Federal Land Bank of Omaha, et al. are designated as "Member Cases." The court's CM/ECF System has the capacity for spreading text among consolidated cases. I f properly docketed, the documents filed in the Lead Case will automatically be filed in the Member Cases. To this end, the parties are instructed to file in the Lead Case, 4:14cv03232, Mansfield v. Federal Land Bank of Omaha, et al. all further d ocuments except those described in paragraph 4 and to select the option "yes" in response to the System's question of whether to spread the text. The parties may not use the spread text feature to file complaints, amended complain ts, and answers; to pay filing fees electronically using pay.gov; to file items related to service of process; or to file notices of appeal. If a party believes that an item in addition to those described in paragraph 4 should not be filed in bot h of these consolidated cases, the party must move for permission to file the item in only one of the cases. The motion must be filed in both of the consolidated cases using the spread text feature. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mansfield et al v. Federal Land Bank of Omaha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AgriBank, FCB
Represented By: Melissa Z. Baris
Represented By: Thomas M. Dee
Represented By: Michael S. Degan
Represented By: Denyse L. Jones
Represented By: David M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Credit Bank of Omaha
Represented By: Melissa Z. Baris
Represented By: Thomas M. Dee
Represented By: Michael S. Degan
Represented By: Denyse L. Jones
Represented By: David M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Land Bank of Omaha
Represented By: Melissa Z. Baris
Represented By: Thomas M. Dee
Represented By: Michael S. Degan
Represented By: Denyse L. Jones
Represented By: David M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin M. Mansfield
Represented By: Daniel H. Skavdahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra K. Mansfield
Represented By: Daniel H. Skavdahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?