Johnson v. Ogg
Plaintiff: DaVaughn Johnson
Defendant: Russell Ogg
Case Number: 4:2015cv03049
Filed: May 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. The court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff DaVaughn Johnson has 30 days in which to file an amended complaint that states a claim upon which relief may be granted. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case: January 15, 2016: check for amended complaint. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Davaughn Johnson shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $3.50 within 30 days, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: June 22, 2015: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (copy mailed to institution as directed) (ADB)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that: Plaintiff is directed to submit the $400.00 fees to the clerks office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. Th e clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case managementdeadline in this matter with the following text: June 8, 2015: Check for MIFP orpayment. ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 6/8/2015.) Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(MLF, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Ogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DaVaughn Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Ogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?