Mentel v. Express Scripts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Herbert G. Mentel
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv03080
Filed: July 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The magistrate judge's findings and recommendation (filing 20 ) are adopted. This action is dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution. Judgment will be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - 1) The motion to permit Randall L. Goyette and the firm of Baylor Evnen Curtiss Grimit & Witt to withdraw as counsel on behalf of Plaintiff, (filing no. 14 ), is granted. 2) If Plaintiff intends to pursue this case, on or before Novem ber 13, 2015, Plaintiff's successor or representative shall: a) file a motion for substitution; and b) obtain the services of counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on Plaintiff's behalf, in the absence of which the court may dismiss Plaintiff's claimswithout further notice.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed as directed)(JAB)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25, Plaintiff's successor or representative shall file a motion for substitution by November 5, 2015. If a motion for substitution is not filed by that date, Plaintiff's claims may be dismissed for want of prosecution. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mentel v. Express Scripts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Nolan
Represented By: Ashley M. Rothe
Represented By: William L. Tannehill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert G. Mentel
Represented By: Randall L. Goyette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?