Garcia v. Casey's General Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Paula Garcia
Defendant: Casey's General Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv03100
Filed: August 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Defendant's motion, (Filing No. 35 ), is denied. Plaintiff's motion, (Filing No. 39 ), is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that counsel for the parties shall confer and, on or before October 6, 2015, they shall jointly file a Form 35 (Rule 26 (f)) Report. If one or more of the parties believes a planning conference is needed to complete the Rule 26(f) Report, or if the parties cannot agree on one or more of the deadlines identified or case progression issues raised in the Rule 26(f) Report, on or before September 29, 2015, a party shall contact my chambers to arrange a conference call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Casey's General Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey's General Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Sievers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Garcia
Represented By: Daniel H. Friedman
Represented By: Jesus A. Tena, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?